GA HB444 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to education, so as to revise the "Move on When Ready Act" and dual credit course; to revise a short title; to provide for certain covered dual credit courses; to provide for certain covered eligible high school students; to provide for maximum covered hours; to provide for high school students to take noncovered dual credit courses at their own expense or with lottery funds; to provide for responsibilities of the commission; to provide for counseling by the postsecondary institution; to provide for application to HOPE scholarship and grant caps; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dual Enrollment Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - House Vote #521 (Y: 103 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #441 (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #181 (Y: 99 N: 72 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01 Effective Date
2020-04-28 Act 327
2020-04-28HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-04-28HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-03-03HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2020-01-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-01-28SenateSenate Third Read
2020-01-27SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-01-13SenateSenate Recommitted
2020-01-13SenateSenate Taken from Table
2019-03-29SenateSenate Tabled
2019-03-29SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-28SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-04HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-26HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-25HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-22HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback