GA HB440 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 11 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Juvenile Code, so as to change the jurisdiction of the juvenile court to include children who are under the age of 18 years; to amend Title 42 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to penal institutions, so as to clarify provisions relating to juveniles; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Juvenile Code; juvenile court to include children who are under the age of 18 years; change jurisdiction
Sponsors
Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Rep. J Collins [R] |
Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House Hopper |