GA HB440 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for a new charter for the City of Ellenton, Georgia, approved April 17, 1975 (Ga. L. 1975, p. 3073), so as to change certain provisions relating to the election and powers of city councilmembers; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ellenton, City of; election and powers of city councilmembers; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #83 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House Vote #95 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House Vote #95 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Effective Date | |
2013-04-24 | Act 68 | |
2013-04-24 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-21 | House | House Hopper |