GA HB44 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to theft, so as to change provisions relating to removal of shopping carts and the required posting of the Code section in stores and markets; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Theft; removal of shopping carts; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Jacobs [R] | Rep. Sean Jerguson [R] | Rep. Allen Peake [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
Rep. Paulette Rakestraw [R] | Rep. Tom Taylor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-01-31 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-01-25 | House Second Readers | |
2011-01-24 | House First Readers |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/32047 |
Text | http://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2011_12/versions/hb44_LC_29_4474_a_2.htm |