GA HB437 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 14 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to education accountability assessment programs, so as to recreate the former Agricultural Education Advisory Commission which had been abolished by operation of law on December 31, 2016; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agricultural Education Advisory Commission; recreate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #225 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #147 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-04-27 Act 34
2017-04-27HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-24SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-24SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-15SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-01HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-01HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-23HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-22HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-21HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback