GA HB437 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 14 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to education accountability assessment programs, so as to recreate the former Agricultural Education Advisory Commission which had been abolished by operation of law on December 31, 2016; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Agricultural Education Advisory Commission; recreate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #225 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #147 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #147 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-04-27 | Act 34 | |
2017-04-27 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-21 | House | House Hopper |