GA HB428 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 36 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to annexation of territory, so as to provide an additional method of annexation for certain municipalities; to provide for procedures; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Annexation of territory; additional method for municipalities; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Jacobs [R] | Rep. Tom Taylor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-02 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-01 | House First Readers |