GA HB427 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 36-88-6, relating to criteria for an enterprise zone, so as to provide for certain criteria for pervasive property; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Enterprise zone; certain criteria for pervasive property; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Gordon [D] | Rep. Cecily Hill [R] | Rep. Helen Hudson [D] | Sen. Eugene Pearson [R] |
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Al Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #220 - Passage (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - House - House Vote #96 - Pass (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - House - House Vote #96 - Pass (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2009-04-21 | Act 45 | |
2009-04-21 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-14 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-17 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-17 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-03 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-03 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-25 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-18 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-17 | House First Readers |