GA HB421 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 17 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to criminal procedure, so as to change provisions relating to the proceedings upon a plea of mental incompetency to stand trial; to provide for definitions and the use of consistent terminology; to provide for a bench trial for competency proceedings; to provide for maximum commitment to the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Disabilities under certain circumstances; to amend the "Crime Victims' Bill of Rights" so as to change provisions relating to victim notification from the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Disabilities; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Criminal procedure; plea of mental incompetency; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Atwood [R] | Sen. Johnny Grant [R] | Rep. Judith Manning [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] |
Rep. Wendell Willard [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #356 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 145 N: 20 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #243 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Vote #187 - Passage (Y: 170 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #243 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Vote #187 - Passage (Y: 170 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-11 | Act 91 | |
2011-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-26 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-16 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-16 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-16 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-03 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-02 | House First Readers |