GA HB410 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 2 of Chapter 12 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to bingo, so as to transfer regulatory authority over bingo from the director of the Georgia Bureau of Investigation to the Secretary of State; to revise definitions; to provide for transfer of authority and continuity of regulations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Bingo; transfer regulatory authority from Georgia Bureau of Investigation to Secretary of State
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. J Collins [R] | Rep. Mitchell Scoggins [R] |
Rep. Mack Jackson [D] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #246 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Passage: House Vote #144 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Passage: House Vote #144 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 193 | |
2021-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-10 | House | House Hopper |