GA HB4 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-25 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-25 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-5-7.4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to bona fide conservation use property, so as to require owners of conservation property to be current on payment of ad valorem taxes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Bona fide conservation use property; owners current on payment of ad valorem taxes; require
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-24 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-23 | House | House Hopper |
2016-11-15 | House | House Prefiled |