GA HB377 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 4 of Title 18 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to property and persons subject to garnishment, so as to change provisions relating to exemptions of pension or retirement funds or benefits; to provide for and revise definitions; to remove some references to federal law; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Garnishment; exemptions of pension or retirement funds or benefits; change provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2013-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-18 | House | House Hopper |