GA HB365 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-26 - Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-26 - Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5C of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to alternative ad valorem taxes on motor vehicles, so as to lower the tax rate imposed; to revise a definition; to revise the date range for antique motor vehicles; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Alternative ad valorem tax; motor vehicles; lower tax rate imposed
Sponsors
Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] |
Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Teri Anulewicz [D] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #421 (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #431 (Y: 147 N: 10 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #314 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #132 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #431 (Y: 147 N: 10 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #314 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #132 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | Senate | Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-20 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-19 | House | House Hopper |