GA HB349 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 43 of the O.C.G.A., relating to professions and businesses, so as to repeal Chapter 10, relating to barbers and cosmetologists, and enact a new chapter that reorganizes, modernizes, and clarifies all aspects of the current regulation of the practice of barbering, esthetics, hair design, cosmetology, and nail care through the State Board of Cosmetology and Barbers; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Barbers and cosmetologists; repeal Chapter 10 and enact a new chapter that reorganizes, modernizes, and clarifies current regulation
Sponsors
Rep. Al Williams [D] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Rick Townsend [R] | Rep. Mike Cameron [R] |
Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] | Rep. Joe Campbell [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #624 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-09 | House | House Hopper |