GA HB339 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 37 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to mental health, so as to provide a means for a competent adult to control either directly through instructions written in advance or indirectly through appointing an agent to make mental health care decisions on behalf of such person according to a written psychiatric advance directive; to provide for the responsibilities and duties of physicians and other mental health care providers and agents under psychiatric advance directives; to provide a statutory psychiatric advance directive form; to provide for construction of such form; to provide for applicability; to provide for statutory construction of chapter; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Mental health; competent adult to control directly or indirectly mental health care decisions; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Gardner [D] | Rep. Mike Jacobs [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] |
Rep. David Ralston [R] | Rep. Pam Stephenson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2009-03-12 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-11 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-10 | House First Readers |