GA HB334 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Euharlee; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to repeal a specific Act; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Euharlee, City of; provide new charter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #70 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House Vote #58 (Y: 149 N: 7 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House Vote #58 (Y: 149 N: 7 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-07 | Act 321 | |
2013-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-02-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-12 | House | House Hopper |