GA HB33 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 25 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-14 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from state income tax, so as to exclude from state income tax certain retirement benefits paid to taxpayers less than 62 years of age for military service in the armed forces of the United States or the reserve components thereof; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax; certain retirement benefits for military service; provide exemption

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-01-13HouseHouse First Readers
2021-01-12HouseHouse Hopper
2020-11-25HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback