GA HB324 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 3 of Title 5 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to procedure for appeals to superior or state court, so as to require the payment of costs of the tribunal appealed from before hearing of an appeal in state court, in the same manner as currently required in superior court; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State courts; require payment of costs of an appeal; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #318 - Passage (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - House - House Vote #176 - Pass (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - House - House Vote #176 - Pass (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-04 | Act 124 | |
2009-05-04 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-13 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-10 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-05 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-10 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-06 | House First Readers |