GA HB32 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 9 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to grants for educational programs, so as to establish a teacher recruitment and retention program for a refundable income tax credit for teachers who agree to teach in certain rural schools or certain low-performing schools; to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from state income taxes, so as to provide for a refundable income tax credit for taxpayers who are participating teachers in said teacher recruitment and retention program; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; teacher recruitment and retention program; provide tax credit
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Belton [R] | Rep. Randy Nix [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] |
Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Jan Tankersley [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Substitute: Senate Vote #445 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Am As Am: House Vote #397 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #353 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 32, Hb 282, Hb 317, Hb 477, Hb 517, & Hb 587: Senate Vote #298 (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Passage: House Vote #156 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Am As Am: House Vote #397 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #353 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 32, Hb 282, Hb 317, Hb 477, Hb 517, & Hb 587: Senate Vote #298 (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Passage: House Vote #156 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-04-21 | Act 27 | |
2021-04-21 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-16 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-01-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-13 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-12 | House | House Hopper |
2020-11-25 | House | House Prefiled |