GA HB316 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 14-7-4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to professional services provided by professional corporations, so as to provide that the practice of medicine and surgery and optometry shall be considered the practice of only one profession for purposes of professional corporations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professional corporations; practice of medicine and surgery and optometry shall be considered the practice of only one profession; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] |
Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #336 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Vote #96 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Vote #96 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 194 | |
2015-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-12 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-11 | House | House Hopper |