GA HB315 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 26 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to registered professional nurses, so as to provide for continuing competency requirements as a requirement for license renewal; to provide for inactive licenses; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Nurses; continuing competency requirements as requirement for license renewal; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Valerie Clark [R] | Rep. Ed Rynders [R] | Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] |
Rep. Sheila Jones [D] | Rep. Barbara Sims [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - House Vote #394 (Y: 136 N: 37 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #268 (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House Vote #107 (Y: 172 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #268 (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House Vote #107 (Y: 172 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 266 | |
2013-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-26 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-12 | House | House Hopper |