GA HB303 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 49-5-41 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to persons and agencies permitted access to records concerning reports of child abuse, so as to authorize solicitors-general and assistant solicitors-general to have access to such reports for official purposes; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Child abuse reports; access to records; solicitors-general; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Collins [R] | Sen. John Crosby [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] |
Rep. David Ralston [R] | Rep. Carlton Rogers [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #814 - Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - House - House Vote #178 - Pass (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2009-03-10 - House - House Vote #178 - Pass (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 424 | |
2010-05-20 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-11 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-10 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-06 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-05 | House First Readers |