GA HB3 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-08 - Effective Date 2021-12-08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-08 - Effective Date 2021-12-08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Coolidge; to provide for pending matters; to provide for definitions and construction; to provide for severability; to provide for related matters; to repeal specific Acts; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Coolidge, City of; provide new charter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-17 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #14 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #7 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #7 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-08 | Effective Date 2021-12-08 | |
2021-12-08 | Act 3EX | |
2021-12-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-11-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-11-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-11-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-11-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-11-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-11-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-11-04 | House | House First Readers |
2021-11-03 | House | House Hopper |