GA HB293 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 8 of Title 24 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to admissions and confessions, so as to provide an effective date for the procedure relating to the testimony of a child's description of sexual contact or physical abuse; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Evidence; procedure relating to child's testimony of sexual contact or physical abuse; provide effective date
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] |
Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - House - House Vote #127 (Y: 161 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-08 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/50372 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/164716 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/50372#14926 |