GA HB292 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 21 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions for the Regents Retirement Plan, so as to eliminate certain remittances required to be made by the University System of Georgia to the Teachers Retirement System of Georgia; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regents Retirement Plan; certain remittances required to be made by the University System of Georgia to the Teachers Retirement System of Georgia; eliminate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #782 (Y: 19 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #783 (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Vote #467 (Y: 159 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01 Effective Date
2020-06-29 Act 402
2020-06-29HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-29HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2020-06-26SenateSenate Third Read
2020-06-26SenateSenate Taken from Table
2020-06-25SenateSenate Tabled
2020-06-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-06-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2020-02-21SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-02-20HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2020-02-20HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-02-19HouseHouse Postponed
2020-01-29HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-14HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-13HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback