GA HB290 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-19 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 11 of Chapter 6 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to miscellaneous provisions regarding the uniform rules of the road, so as to require the securing or containing of live animals in the back of motor vehicles operated on certain roads; to provide for exceptions; to provide for a fine; to specify the basis for probable cause; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; securing or containing of live animals in the back of vehicles operated on certain roads; require
Sponsors
Rep. Karla Drenner [D] | Rep. Tom Rice [R] | Rep. Al Williams [D] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
Rep. Jay Roberts [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-10 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/43521 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/147348 |