GA HB273 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to the Department of Natural Resources, so as to extend the date by which rules and regulations prescribed by the Board of Natural Resources must be in effect for purposes of establishing criminal violations of said rules and regulations; to amend Part 7 of Article 7 of Chapter 3 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Sapelo Island Heritage Authority, so as to amend the composition and chairmanship of the Sapelo Island Heritage Authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Natural Resources; extend date by which rules and regulations must be in effect for purposes of establishing criminal violations
Sponsors
Rep. Buddy DeLoach [R] | Rep. Rick Townsend [R] | Rep. Al Williams [D] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] |
Sen. Mike Hodges [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - House - Agree To Senate Sub As Am: House Vote #331 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #267 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 2nd: Senate Vote #266 (Y: 23 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-03-02 - House - Passage: House Vote #143 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #267 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 2nd: Senate Vote #266 (Y: 23 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-03-02 - House - Passage: House Vote #143 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-01 | House | House Postponed |
2023-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-07 | House | House Hopper |