GA HB258 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to sexual offenses, so as to provide a response to State v. Williams, 2020 Ga. LEXIS 85 (February 10, 2020); to provide that, when a victim is under the age of 16, consent of the victim shall not be a defense to a prosecution for sodomy, aggravated sodomy, child molestation, aggravated child molestation, sexual battery, and aggravated sexual battery; to make conforming changes; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; response to State v. Williams, 2020 Ga. LEXIS 85; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Sainz [R] | Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] | Rep. Beth Camp [R] | Rep. James Burchett [R] |
Rep. Heath Clark [R] | Rep. Joseph Gullett [R] | Sen. Sheila McNeill [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - Agree Sen Am: House Vote #445 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #419 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #213 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #419 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #213 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-04-21 | Act 16 | |
2021-04-21 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-02 | House | House Hopper |