GA HB253 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide that future elections for the office of probate judge of Athens-Clarke County shall be nonpartisan elections held at the time of certain general primary elections; to provide for submission of this Act under the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Athens-Clarke County; probate judge; provide nonpartisan elections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #222 (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Vote #136 (Y: 134 N: 24 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Vote #136 (Y: 134 N: 24 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Effective Date | |
2013-04-24 | Act 48 | |
2013-04-24 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-07 | House | House Hopper |