GA HB250 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 49-5-69.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to fingerprint and preliminary records check for foster homes, so as to provide that an employee of an early care and education program who has received a satisfactory fingerprint records check determination within the previous 24 months is exempt from submitting applications for an additional background check for purposes of providing care to children placed in a foster home; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Foster homes; employee with satisfactory fingerprint records check in past 24 months exempt from additional background check; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] | Rep. Matt Dollar [R] | Rep. Terry Rogers [R] |
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #390 (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #295 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Vote #71 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #295 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Vote #71 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 191 | |
2017-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-02 | House | House Hopper |