GA HB247 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 11 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to emergency medical services personnel, so as to authorize the Department of Community Health to require fingerprinting and criminal background investigations of all applicants for licensure and currently licensed emergency medical services personnel; to provide definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Community Health, Department of; fingerprint and investigate emergency medical services personnel; require
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Beardon [R] | Rep. Henry Howard [D] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Rep. Jay Neal [R] |
Rep. Butch Parrish [R] | Rep. Willie Talton [R] | Rep. Earnest Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #842 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 157 N: 3 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #749 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #635 - Passage (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #749 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #635 - Passage (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-16 | Act 580 | |
2012-04-16 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-05 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-07 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-03 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-16 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-15 | House First Readers |