GA HB245 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 35 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to podiatry practice, so as to amend a provision relating to fingerprint and criminal background checks; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professions and businesses; podiatry; amend a provision relating to fingerprint and criminal background checks
Sponsors
Rep. John LaHood [R] | Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] |
Rep. Susan Holmes [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #380 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #199 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #74 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #199 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #74 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-05-04 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 184 | |
2021-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-22 | House | House Postponed |
2021-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-02 | House | House Hopper |