GA HB242 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Americus, approved April 13, 1992 (Ga. L. 1992, p. 5985), as amended, so as to remove a requirement for city manager; to lengthen the contract term allowed for city manager; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Americus, City of; requirement for city manager; remove
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #42 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #22 (Y: 123 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #22 (Y: 123 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-05-03 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 51 | |
2021-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-08 | House | House Postponed |
2021-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-02 | House | House Hopper |