GA HB237 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the imposition, rate, and computation of and exemptions from state income tax, so as to extend the angel investor tax credit; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State income tax; angel investor tax credit; extend
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] | Rep. Mark Hamilton [R] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] |
Rep. Matthew Ramsey [R] | Rep. Charles Williams [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #245 (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Vote #168 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Vote #168 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-05 | Act 66 | |
2015-05-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-04 | House | House Hopper |