GA HB236 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the organization of the executive branch generally, so as to establish the "Georgia Government Accountability Act"; to provide for a short title; to provide for legislative intent; to create the Legislative Sunset Advisory Committee; to authorize the committee to review and evaluate state agencies' productivity, efficiency, and responsiveness; to provide for the automatic abolition of certain state agencies; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Government Accountability Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Beardon [R] | Rep. Charlice Byrd [R] | Rep. John Cox [R] | Rep. Tom Graves [R] |
Rep. Calvin Hill [R] | Sen. Barry Loudermilk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | House Third Reading Lost | |
2010-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-26 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2009-02-03 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-02 | House First Readers |