GA HB23 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-11 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 31 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to charter schools, so as to provide for certain accountability requirements for charter schools; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for disfavored practices with respect to assessments; to provide for transparency regarding assessments; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charter schools; certain accountability requirements; provide

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-10HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-09HouseHouse Hopper
2017-01-05HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback