GA HB224 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 13 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to organization of schools and school systems under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to provide that a military student may attend any school in the local school system; to provide a definition; to provide for a streamlined process and annual notice; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Quality Basic Education Act; military student may attend any school in local system; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #240 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Vote #114 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-04-27 Act 31
2017-04-27HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-24SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-24SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-20SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-27SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-24HouseHouse Passed/Adopted As Amended
2017-02-24HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-23HouseHouse Postponed
2017-02-22HouseHouse Postponed
2017-02-17HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-07HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-02HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-01HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback