GA HB222 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to clarify, streamline, and make transparent the practices of the department of insurance; to provide that property insurance does not include service contracts sold or offered for sale to persons other than consumers; to allow the Commissioner of Insurance to issue a probationary license for a period not longer than 24 months; to allow, at the Commissioner of Insurance's discretion, an applicant whose application has been refused to reapply for a license after one year; to require specific language in public adjuster contracts; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance, Department of; clarify, streamline, and make transparent the practices of the department
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Steve Tarvin [R] | Rep. Noel Williams [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] |
Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #265 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #73 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #73 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective Date 2023-05-03 | |
2023-05-03 | Act 265 | |
2023-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-02-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-02 | House | House Hopper |