GA HB222 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to repeal an Act creating a new charter for the Town of Pendergrass, approved December 30, 1890 (Ga. L. 1890-91, Vol. II, p. 681), as amended; to provide for transfer of duties and obligations to Jackson County; to provide for transfer of all legal rights, privileges, and assets to Jackson County; to establish a special tax and service district for outstanding bonded indebtedness and other obligations; to provide for transfer of all federal and state permits and licenses; to provide for the transfer of ongoing judicial actions; to provide for the continuation of zoning and land use regulations; to provide for future proceeds of special and regular local option sales taxes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pendergrass, Town of; transfer of duties and obligations to Jackson County; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-01 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59184 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/196430 |