GA HB220 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Commissioners of Crisp County, approved August 8, 1908 (Ga. L. 1908, p. 295), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 23, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 4091), so as to change the descriptions of commissioner districts and posts for the election of members of the board of commissioners; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members until the expiration of the terms of office to which they were elected; to provide for other matters; to provide for submission of this Act for approval under the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crisp County; Board of Commissioners; change descriptions of districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #42 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House Vote #27 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - House - House Vote #27 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Effective Date | |
2013-04-24 | Act 42 | |
2013-04-24 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-02-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-05 | House | House Hopper |