GA HB203 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-86 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to special license plates promoting or supporting certain worthy agencies, funds, or nonprofit corporations with proceeds disbursed to the general fund and the agency, fund, or nonprofit corporation, so as to establish a specialty license plate to benefit the Tybee Island Historical Society; to provide for related matters; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Special license plates; Tybee Island Historical Society; establish
Sponsors
Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Buddy DeLoach [R] | Rep. Steven Sainz [R] |
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Sen. Derek Mallow [D] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #811 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #690 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #690 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-05-02 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 737 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-29 | House | House Hopper |