GA HB199 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1A of Article 1 of Chapter 6 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to timber harvesting and removal requirements, so as to require notice of timber harvesting only in an approved form; to provide that one bond shall be required for each county; to provide that no county may require an administrative fee for receiving a notice of timber harvesting; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Timber harvesting; require notice only in an approved form; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] | Rep. James Shaw [R] | Rep. James Epps [R] |
Rep. Amy Carter [R] | Rep. Dominic Lariccia [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #207 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Vote #73 (Y: 172 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Vote #73 (Y: 172 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 124 | |
2015-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-03 | House | House Hopper |