GA HB193 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elementary and secondary education, so as to provide for a 180 day school year or the equivalent thereof; to revise a provision relating to a full-day kindergarten program; to revise certain provisions relating to the base pay of school food and nutrition personnel; to revise a provision relating to the residential high school program for gifted youth; to revise the definition of the term "school year" relating to teacher contracts; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elementary and secondary education; 180 day school year; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Tommy Benton [R] | Sen. Jim Butterworth [R] | Rep. David Casas [R] | Rep. Tom Graves [R] |
Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] | Rep. Jeff May [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #448 - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Substitute (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House Vote #421 - Agree Sen Sub As Am (Y: 155 N: 3 NV: 14 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #310 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #309 - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By Senator From The 32nd To Committee Sub (Y: 9 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #209 - Pass (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House Vote #421 - Agree Sen Sub As Am (Y: 155 N: 3 NV: 14 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #310 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #309 - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By Senator From The 32nd To Committee Sub (Y: 9 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #209 - Pass (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-04 | Act 118 | |
2009-05-04 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-13 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2009-04-01 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-30 | House Second Readers | |
2009-01-29 | House First Readers |