GA HB187 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Veto V3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Department of Community Health, so as to provide for a pilot program to provide coverage for the treatment and management of obesity and related conditions, including medications and counseling; to provide a definition; to provide for eligibility; to provide for requirements; to provide for a review of results and outcomes; to provide for an evaluation report on such program; to provide for termination of the pilot program; to provide for automatic repeal; to provide for related matters; to provide for contingent effectiveness; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Health, Department of; pilot program to provide coverage for the treatment and management of obesity and related conditions; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #316 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Vote #85 (Y: 148 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Veto V3
2019-05-10HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-29SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-26SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-02-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback