GA HB182 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-5-67.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to chemical tests, implied consent notices, rights of motorists, test results, refusal to submit to testing, and suspension of licenses, so as to clarify provisions relating to acquisition of evidence; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; acquisition of evidence; clarify provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Setzler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2015-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-02 | House | House Hopper |