GA HB181 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to reincorporate and provide a new charter for the City of Marshallville in Macon County, approved March 19, 1987 (Ga. L. 1987, p. 3993), so as to revise the manner of filling a vacancy in the office of mayor or councilmember; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Marshallville, City of; filling a vacancy in the office of mayor or councilmember; revise manner
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #30 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Vote #25 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Vote #25 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Effective Date | |
2015-04-29 | Act 30 | |
2015-04-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-02 | House | House Hopper |