GA HB181 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Veto V3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Veto V3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 33 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the scholarship program for special needs students, so as to provide for the waiver of one of the scholarship requirements under certain conditions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Special needs scholarship program; waiver one requirement; provide
Sponsors
Rep. David Casas [R] | Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] | Rep. Rich Golick [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] |
Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Rep. Randy Nix [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #825 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 115 N: 51 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #670 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Vote #145 - Passage (Y: 115 N: 33 NV: 19 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Vote #43 - Passage (Y: 93 N: 73 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #670 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Vote #145 - Passage (Y: 115 N: 33 NV: 19 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House Vote #43 - Passage (Y: 93 N: 73 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Veto V3 | |
2012-05-07 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-05 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-01-30 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-09 | Senate Recommitted | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-14 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-04 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-09 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-07 | House First Readers |