GA HB18 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 35 of the O.C.G.A., relating to law enforcement officers and agencies, so as to require that certain procedures be followed by peace officers upon making contact with individuals for law enforcement purposes; to require all law enforcement agencies provide a body-worn camera to each peace officer of the law enforcement agency; to amend Article 2 of Chapter 21 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to state tort claims; to amend Article 2 of Chapter 4 of Title 17 of the O.C.G.A., relating to arrest by law enforcement officers generally, so as to revise use of force standards; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Police Accountability Act; enact

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-03HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-02HouseHouse Hopper
2020-11-16HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback