GA HB174 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-1-8 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to safe operations of motor carriers, commercial motor vehicles, and drivers, safe transportation of hazardous materials, and penalties, so as to update the reference date to federal regulations regarding the safe operation of motor carriers and commercial motor vehicles; to revise a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; federal regulations regarding safe operation of motor carriers and commercial motor vehicles; update reference date
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] | Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Rep. Tyler Smith [R] | Rep. Clint Crowe [R] |
Rep. Rob Leverett [R] | Rep. David Jenkins [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #330 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - Passage: House Vote #26 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - Passage: House Vote #26 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-06 | Act 232 | |
2021-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-28 | House | House Hopper |