GA HB174 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 2 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to registration and licensing of motor vehicles generally, so as to provide for the proper display of license plates; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; proper display of license plates; provide
Sponsors
Rep. David Wilkerson [D] | Rep. Kimberly Alexander [D] | Rep. Michael Smith [D] | Rep. William Boddie [D] |
Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-06 | House | House Hopper |